FL S1722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "enclave"; prohibiting an area from being annexed if more than a specified percent of the land in the area is owned by individuals, corporations, or legal entities, unless the owners of more than a specified percent of the land in the area consent to such annexation, etc.
Title
Annexation of Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1121 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
171 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
171 | 0413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
171 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
171 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1722 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1722/BillText/Filed/HTML |