FL S1722 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the comprehensive electronic database system containing information concerning prescriptions of controlled substances comply with the minimum requirements for authentication and certification of the National All Schedules Prescription Electronic Reporting Act. Authorizes the State Surgeon General to enter into agreements with other states to exchange prescription drug monitoring information after specified conditions are met, etc.
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211) | |
2010-03-15 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00191 | |
2010-03-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-09 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00246 | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00118 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2272 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-211
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0893 | 0551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |