FL S1716 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a county or an eligible municipality participating in the State Housing Initiatives Partnership Program to establish through its local housing assistance plan a local government risk mitigation program; requiring the Florida Housing Finance Corporation to establish guidelines for the administration of the local government risk mitigation program; revising the percentages of local housing assistance plan funds that may be used for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H301 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
420518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback