FL S1708 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699; Amendment(s) adopted (652748, 446552, 161094) -SJ 00699; Substituted CS/HB 765 -SJ 00699; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 765 (Ch. 2010-87) -SJ 00699
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Cites this act as the "Ivonne Rodriguez Horse Protection Act." Prohibits specified acts relating to horsemeat for human consumption. Increases the classification of offenses relating to horsemeat for human consumption. Provides for suspension of licenses of certain businesses for offenses relating to horsemeat. Revises provisions prohibiting certain acts relating to horses to apply to all horses regardless of breed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Slaughter of Horses [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699; Amendment(s) adopted (652748, 446552, 161094) -SJ 00699; Substituted CS/HB 765 -SJ 00699; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 765 (Ch. 2010-87) -SJ 00699
2010-04-14 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00551
2010-04-13 Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 37-S
2010-04-01 Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00350
2010-03-30 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-26 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00361
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00117
2010-02-10 Referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
2010-02-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0765 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-87

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0500451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0828125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback