FL S1704 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging the enhancement of the sister-state relationship and bilateral economic and cultural ties between Florida and the Republic of China, also known as Taiwan, and reaffirming and maintaining the commitment of the State of Florida to its strong and deepening relationship with the Republic of China, as the two embrace the same fundamental values of freedom, democracy, and the protection of human rights, etc.
Title
Taiwan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8021 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1704 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1704/BillText/Filed/HTML |