FL S1700 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1253
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the circumstances under which the Attorney General may request information from the prescription drug monitoring program to include an active investigation or pending civil or criminal litigation involving prescribed controlled substances; requiring the Department of Health to assign each patient a unique identifying number when releasing certain information; authorizing the Attorney General to introduce as evidence in certain actions specified information that is released to the Attorney General from the program's records system, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescribed Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1253
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1253
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-09SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-08SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2019-04-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1253 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback