FL S1700 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1253 (Ch. 2019-127)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1253 (Ch. 2019-127)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the circumstances under which the Attorney General may request information from the prescription drug monitoring program to include an active investigation or pending civil or criminal litigation involving prescribed controlled substances; requiring the Department of Health to assign each patient a unique identifying number when releasing certain information; authorizing the Attorney General to introduce as evidence in certain actions specified information that is released to the Attorney General from the program's records system, etc.
Title
Prescribed Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1253 (Ch. 2019-127) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1253 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1253 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-127, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2019-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 0551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |