FL S1696 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying information to be provided on sentencing scoresheets concerning restoration of voting rights, etc.
Title
Restoration of Voting Rights Information on Sentencing Scoresheets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H501 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1696 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1696/BillText/Filed/HTML |