FL S1696 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7011
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7011
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Zachary Martin Act"; revising requirements for the availability of automated external defibrillators on school grounds; delaying implementation of a requirement that certain school employees and volunteers complete specified training; requiring that a medical evaluation be performed before a student begins conditioning; applying requirements related to medical evaluations to activities occurring outside the school year, etc.
Title
Student Athletes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7011 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7011 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7011 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-91
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |