FL S1694 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the apportionment of awards of damages for takings claims within areas of critical state concern, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Takings Claims Within Areas of Critical State Concern

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-26SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-03-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1019 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback