FL S1692 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to establish and implement a Medicaid buy-in program for certain individuals with disabilities; providing requirements for the program; requiring the agency to seek federal waiver approval or submit any state plan amendments necessary to implement the program by a specified date; requiring the agency to implement the program upon receiving federal approval, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Buy-in Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2022-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H675 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1822 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4099141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback