FL S1692 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 787
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring application forms for original, renewal, and replacement driver licenses and identification cards to include language allowing a voluntary contribution to the Live Like Bella Childhood Cancer Foundation; authorizing a person with specified disabilities to have the capital letter "D" exhibited on his or her driver license under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 787
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 787
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-04SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1694 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 789
H787 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Ordered enrolled
H789 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32214Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback