FL S1686 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an annual use fee for the Blue Angels license plate; directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Blue Angels license plate, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates/Blue Angels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S620 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
S620 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-144
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1686 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1686/BillText/Filed/HTML |