FL S1682 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an election alert system to notify electors of certain voting information, etc.
Title
Election Alert System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1275 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1682 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1682/BillText/Filed/HTML |