FL S1674 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring individual education plans for certain students to contain information and instruction on the legal rights and responsibilities regarding educational decisions which transfer to students at the age of 18; requiring such information to include ways in which a student may provide informed consent to allow his or her parent to continue to participate in his or her educational decisions, etc.
Title
Individual Education Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1317 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules