FL S1664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excluding sensory deprivation tanks used for flotation therapy from the definition of the term "public swimming pool" or "public pool"; exempting sensory deprivation tanks from regulation by the Department of Health as a public pool, etc.
Title
Sensory Deprivation Tanks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
514 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1664 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1664/BillText/Filed/HTML |