FL S1662 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the types of information that the Department of Management Services or a contractor providing dependent eligibility verification services may require from subscribers in order to establish dependent eligibility for state group insurance program enrollment; deleting a provision requiring the Division of State Group Insurance and the contractor to disclose to subscribers that dependent eligibility verification information may be subject to disclosure and inspection under public records laws under certain circumstances; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of Management Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2022-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1660 (Related) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H1445 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
H1443 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S7026 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11012301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback