FL S1662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to the preemption of the field of regulation of firearms and ammunition to the Legislature, to the exclusion of local jurisdictions, etc.
Title
Preemption of Firearms and Ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6061 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1532 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H6069 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1532 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H6069 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1662 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1662/BillText/Filed/HTML |