FL S1660 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Education to annually verify that school districts, charter schools, and specified private schools implement certain instruction relating to the history of the Holocaust and the history of African Americans; providing requirements for school districts, charter schools, and specified private schools relating to such instruction; requiring that a district school superintendent's salary be withheld under certain circumstances; requiring certain statewide, standardized assessments to include, when appropriate, curricula content from the history of the Holocaust and the history of African Americans, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H91 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S184 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H1283 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback