FL S1658 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted HB 7119 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7119 (Ch. 2010-89) -SJ 00669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the public records exemption for a trade secret used in designing and constructing a hurricane loss model and provided by a private company to the Florida Commission on Hurricane Loss Projection Methodology, the OIR, or an appointed consumer advocate to specify that the exemption applies to trade secrets as defined in the Uniform Trade Secrets Act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Hurricane Loss Model [CPSC]

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00669; Substituted HB 7119 -SJ 00669; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7119 (Ch. 2010-89) -SJ 00669
2010-04-16 Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00644
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-14 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636; CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -SJ 00638
2010-04-09 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S
2010-04-08 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00523
2010-04-07 Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 412-K
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00114
2010-02-10 Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2010-02-03 SPB 7042 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1658) by Banking and Insurance; Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7119 (Similar To) 2010-05-15 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-89

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
06270628Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback