FL S1652 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to establish and maintain a sickle-cell registry for a specified purpose; requiring the department to analyze the reported information and make certain determinations; providing duties for the department to promote early detection and treatment of sickle-cell disease; requiring the department to adopt rules requiring screening of newborns for sickle-cell disease and sickle-cell trait, etc.
Title
Sickle-cell Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1067 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H1085 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
H1085 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1652 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1652/BillText/Filed/HTML |