FL S1648 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the educational requirements that must be satisfied by applicants before examination by the Department of Health; requiring the department to issue a license by endorsement to practice chiropractic medicine to applicants who meet certain requirements, including the payment of a fee; revising the educational requirements that must be satisfied by applicants before the department may issue a chiropractic medicine faculty certificate; revising grounds for denial of a license or disciplinary action relating to failing to preserve identity of funds and property of a patient, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiropractic Medicine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
460402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604167Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback