FL S1644 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring district school board rules to include a longer public review period for student editions of recommended instructional materials; requiring public access to and an opportunity to comment on instructional materials recommended for adoption; exempting certain instructional materials from certain public review procedures under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional Materials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-12SenateCS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H827 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100640Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback