FL S1642 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting the requirement that a physician be physically present in the same room when informing a pregnant woman of specified information for purposes of obtaining informed consent for termination of a pregnancy; deleting the requirement that such information be provided within a specified timeframe; deleting the requirement that a physician perform an ultrasound on a pregnant woman and inform her of the probable gestational age of the fetus for purposes of obtaining informed consent for a termination of pregnancy, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informed Consent for Termination Of Pregnancy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2022-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6023 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S628 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback