FL S1642 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Commerce And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the rate of the tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax on Commercial Real Property Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1112 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback