FL S1636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a prohibition against persons receiving certain fees, consideration, or gratuities under the Workers' Compensation Law; increasing the maximum number of weeks of benefits payable for temporary total disability, temporary partial disability, and temporary total disability; requiring injured employees and other claimants to sign and attest to a specified statement relating to the payment of attorney fees before engaging an attorney or other representative for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1399 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 1915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |