FL S1620 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting certain physicians from specified licensing requirements when providing certain services to veterans in this state; requiring such physicians to submit specified documentation to the Department of Health; requiring an exempted physician to attest that he or she will provide medical services only to veterans under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Licensing Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-10SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H885 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback