FL S1616 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting separate ad valorem taxes or non-ad valorem assessments against the land upon which a multiple parcel building is located; specifying the allocation of land value to the assessed value of parcels containing condominiums and cooperatives; providing for the survivability of easements for the support of certain improvements after tax sales and deeds, etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 0237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1616 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1616/BillText/Filed/HTML |