FL S1614 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1575 (Ch. 2023-296)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1575 (Ch. 2023-296)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a licensed contractor to submit a certain design if an interior radio coverage and signal strength assessment of a new building determines a two-way radio communications enhancement system installation is required; requiring new and existing buildings to meet certain minimum radio signal strength requirements, except under certain circumstances; exempting certain installations of two-way radio communications enhancement systems from prohibitions against the installation or transportation of certain radio equipment, etc.
Title
Public Safety Emergency Communications Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1575 (Ch. 2023-296) |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1575 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1575 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Chapter No. 2023-296
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |