FL S1612 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that it is the policy of this state to promote certain alternative fuels and vehicle technologies; authorizing the department to consider the use of a fumigant as a pesticide for raw agricultural commodities fumigation when specifying certain license classifications; revising the types of minor food outlets required to obtain food permits from the department; requiring bottled water to be processed in conformance with department rule; providing that substance abuse marketing service providers are subject to the Florida Telemarketing Act; revising the milk facilities required to apply for a permit to operate, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H679 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-177
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H1289 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
H1291 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
S1906 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-177
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H1289 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
H1291 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
S1906 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 6055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
502 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
531 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 927 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
586 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 1141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 1142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
593 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
597 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1612 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1612/BillText/Filed/HTML |