FL S1612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1211
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Ellie's Law"; requiring, by a specified date, a commercial airboat operator to have specified documents on board the airboat while carrying passengers for hire; requiring all airboat operators carrying passengers for hire to complete a boater education course; providing a penalty for violation of airboat operation requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airboat Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1211
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1211
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (818274)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2018-01-23SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2018-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/22/18, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1211 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-137

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
327391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback