FL S1608 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "personal protective equipment"; prohibiting dissemination of false or misleading information relating to personal protective equipment under certain circumstances with specified intent; providing criminal penalties; prohibiting dissemination of false or misleading vaccine information under certain circumstances with specified intent, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Consumers Against Pandemic-related Fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2021-03-17SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-17SenateRemaining references corrected to Rules
2021-03-17SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary
2021-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/16/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-03-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2021-02-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817418Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback