FL S1606 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a certain electronic signature requirement for a motor vehicle salvage certificate of title; authorizing the payment of certain workers' compensation benefits to be transmitted to the employee's account with a licensed money transmitter; revising criteria for assessing a residential condominium unit owner's loss assessment coverage; specifying sales practice requirements, prohibited sales practices, and authorized sales practices relating to travel insurance, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#721 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-63
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-02-06SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H895 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H999 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1334 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1408 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H359 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1606 passed
H1137 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64708Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback