FL S1596 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the priority of bridge-the-gap alimony, followed by rehabilitative alimony, over any other form; requiring a court to make written findings regarding the basis for awarding a combination of forms of alimony, including the type of alimony and length of time for which it is awarded; providing that the party seeking alimony has the burden of proof of demonstrating a need for alimony and that the other party has the ability to pay alimony, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1325 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6119Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback