FL S1594 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337 922
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring any nurse desiring to be licensed as an advanced practice registered nurse to apply to the Department of Health, submit proof that he or she holds a current license to practice professional nursing, and meet one or more specified requirements as determined by the Board of Nursing; authorizing the board to adopt rules to provide for provisional state licensure of certified nurse midwives, certified nurse practitioners, certified registered nurse anesthetists, clinical nurse specialists, and psychiatric nurses for a specified period of time; authorizing certain certified practitioners to continue practicing advanced nursing during a specified period of time, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337 922
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1337 922
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-02-22SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1337 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-106

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100966Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1210515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976793Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009974Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009976Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
467003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback