FL S1594 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the terms "agency," "energy, water, and wastewater efficiency and conservation measure," and "energy, water, or wastewater cost savings"; providing that a contract may provide for repayments to a lender of an installation construction loan in installments for a period not to exceed 20 years; authorizing certain facility alterations to be included in a performance contract and to be supervised by the performance savings contractor; requiring that a proposed contract include an investment-grade audit certified by the Department of Management Services which states that the cost savings are appropriate and sufficient for the term of the contract, etc.
Title
Guaranteed Energy, Water, and Wastewater Performance Savings Contracting Act
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Senate Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#338 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Chapter No. 2013-135 | |
2013-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1357 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/16/13, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Now in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/01/13, 3:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs |
2013-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1357 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1594 (Ch. 2013-135)