FL S1590 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising available sanctions for any person who fails to attend court as a juror without any sufficient excuse; restricting a court from imposing a term of imprisonment on any person who fails to attend as a juror without any sufficient excuse and is found in contempt of court unless the person is able to obtain legal representation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juror Sanctions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-06SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1125 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback