FL S1584 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring agencies that participate in the state group insurance program to review other-personal-services employees eligible to enroll in the program to consider their placement in authorized full-time equivalent positions, etc.
Title
Other-personal-services Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1584 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1584/BillText/Filed/HTML |