FL S1582 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for proprietary business information relating to high pressure well stimulations obtained by the Department of Environmental Protection in connection with the department's online high pressure well stimulation chemical disclosure registry; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/High-pressure Well Stimulation Chemical Disclosure Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 7 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/15, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/31/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1468 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table
H1209 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
H1205 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1209 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
H1205 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar