FL S1576 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring specified entities that take receivership of lost or stray dogs or cats to adopt written policies and procedures to ensure that every reasonable effort is made to quickly and reliably return owned animals to their owners; authorizing a court to prohibit certain offenders from owning or having custody or control over animals; revising the ranking of offenses on the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#896 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#68 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Chapter No. 2018-87
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0
2018-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-09HouseReceived
2018-03-08HouseIn Messages
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-15SenateRemaining references corrected to Rules
2018-02-15SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice
2018-02-14SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-07SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2018-02-07SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-02-07SenateRemaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-01SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-01-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H823 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
H473 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S952 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
823151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback