FL S1574 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the method for determining the amounts of potential surcharges to be levied against policyholders under certain circumstances; specifying a limit for agent commission rates; providing that eligible surplus lines insurers may participate, in the same manner and on the same terms as an authorized insurer, in depopulation, take-out, or keep-out programs relating to policies removed from Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, etc.
Title
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/16/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |