FL S1572 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing the Legislature's support for the adoption of policies that will prepare Florida for the environmental and economic impact of climate change, sea-level rise, and flooding, and recognizing the important role that resiliency and infrastructure will play in fortifying this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate Change

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateAdopted
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-10SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Environment and Natural Resources
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback