FL S1570 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing the date by which the division must submit an annual report regarding the allocation of library funding to the Chief Financial Officer; revising the duties and responsibilities of the division in the administration of the Florida State Archives; revising the duties and responsibilities of the division in the administration of the records and information management program; removing a limitation on the annual grant amount that the administrative unit of a library cooperative may receive from the state for purposes of sharing library resources, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Library and Information Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-03SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1455 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Now in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25742Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback