FL S1564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of automated telephone dialing systems using certain types of messages under certain circumstances; authorizing such use in response to certain inquiries; providing a limitation; revising provisions for the award of attorney fees and costs, etc.
Title
Telephone Solicitation
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-23 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (281344, 421130) 440 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1095 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar