FL S1562 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting an agency from entering into or renewing a contract for goods or services with a company that is domiciled in a state or territory that enacts legislation establishing restrictions on abortion in violation of United States Supreme Court precedent; specifying conditions upon which legislation is deemed to be in violation of Supreme Court precedent; requiring contracts entered into or renewed on or after a specified date to authorize immediate termination of the contract if certain conditions exist, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Contracting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2871351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback