FL S1550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring candidates seeking to qualify for election to the office of circuit judge or county court judge to include a completed application form consistent with that of a judicial nominating commission in their qualifying papers; requiring such candidates to post the completed form on a campaign website, etc.
Title
Judicial Candidate Qualifying
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1550 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1550/BillText/Filed/HTML |