FL S1550 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that an animal owner who abandons the animal has no expectation of privacy in the animal's body or remains, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Agriculture
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-01-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1147 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70519Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback