FL S1550 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person, for commercial purposes, from knowingly selling an imitation firearm after a specified date; prohibiting a person on or after a specified date from knowingly altering, changing, removing, or obliterating certain features required by law for an imitation firearm; prohibiting a person from knowingly displaying or exposing an imitation firearm in a public place after a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imitation Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1143 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559956Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559957Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559958Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559959Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback