FL S1548 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "developed waterfront property" and "safe harbor"; specifying how vessels may be anchored or moored outside public mooring fields on the waters of this state; providing a noncriminal infraction; providing an exception for counties or municipalities participating in the anchoring and mooring pilot program, etc.
Title
Vessel Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/14/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/31/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7123 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 4107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |