FL S1542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the monetary requirements for pretrial release to include cash bail bonds; deleting surety bail bonds for criminal offenses; revising the state's time to respond to seek extradition of a fugitive defendant after receiving written notice from the surety agent or bail agency; requiring the state to enter a defendant into the National Crime Information Center database for the National Law Enforcement Telecommunications System region or regions within a specified timeframe if the state is willing to extradite a fugitive defendant, etc.
Title
Bail Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1424 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 0471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 286 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
907 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1542 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |